House | 03/06/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2016 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Involuntary Calendar by a vote of 18 yeas and 16 nays. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2016 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |