House | 03/08/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/09/2016. | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | ||
House | 03/08/2016 | Reported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | ||
House | 03/06/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2016 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |