Senate
|
03/02/2016
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution, having the required two-thirds vote of the elected members, was concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 2/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2016
|
Reported favorably (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2016
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2016
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2016
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|