Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/16/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 3/10/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2016
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 1 nay.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/08/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/07/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2016
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|