House
|
06/22/2016
|
Effective date: 06/22/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 13. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2016
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|