House
|
06/28/2016
|
Effective date: 06/28/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 11.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 64, nays 27, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 17 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 38. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/13/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|