House
|
06/15/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 49. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/15/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/13/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Reported without amendments (5-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2016
|
Reported with amendments (9-4).
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|