House | 06/15/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2016 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |