House | 06/22/2016 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/21/2016 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | ||
House | 06/21/2016 | Reported favorably (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | ||
House | 06/20/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 06/20/2016 | Amended. | ||
House | 06/20/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/19/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/17/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2016 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |