Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Effective date 7/1/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 12. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Reported favorably (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|