House | 06/19/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/17/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 06/15/2016 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2016 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |