House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: 07/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 17.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/8/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 63, nays 38. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Tarver, and Alario.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Henry, Smith, and Barras.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 06/01.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 1 for 05/13/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 2 for 05/12/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported with amendments (18-4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|