House | 05/18/2016 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 54. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/18/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016. | ||
House | 05/11/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 04/06/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Read by title. |