Senate | 05/17/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/12/2016 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Made Special Order of the day No. 1 for 05/12/2016. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/09/2016 | Reported with amendments (17-6). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/19/2016. | ||
House | 02/15/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/15/2016 | Prefiled. |