House
|
05/31/2016
|
Effective date: 01/01/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 297.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2016
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|