House | 05/17/2016 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/27/2016 | Notice removed | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016. | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Reported favorably (8-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/19/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/19/2016. | ||
House | 02/16/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/16/2016 | Prefiled. |