Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 15. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|