House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: 07/01/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 569.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|