Senate | 05/09/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2016. | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/28/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016. | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 151 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (16-0). |