House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: 07/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 572.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 682 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (15-0).
|
|
|