Senate | 05/30/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/09/2016 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 720 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (10-0). |