House | 05/18/2016 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 51. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/17/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016. | ||
House | 05/12/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2016 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 497 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (10-0). |