House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 06/01.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 14. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 8 for 05/13/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 9 for 05/12/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Reported with amendments (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|