House | 05/26/2016 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 27, nays 50. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 05/26/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/25/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2016. | ||
House | 05/25/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016. | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 03/23/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Read by title. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/01/2016 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |