Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Notice House sustained the Governor's veto.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Veto message read, by a vote of 93 yeas and 0 nays, veto sustained.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2016
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 06/01.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 3. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 9 for 05/13/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 10 for 05/12/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|