Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Notice House sustained the Governor's veto.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2016
|
Veto message read, by a vote of 52 yeas and 44 nays, veto sustained.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2016
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|