House
|
04/26/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 31. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 46. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|