House | 04/19/2016 | Withdrawn from the files of the House. | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016. | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Notice removed | ||
House | 04/05/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2016. | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/28/2016 | Reported favorably (7-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 01/29/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/29/2016. | ||
House | 01/26/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 01/26/2016 | Prefiled. |