Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 37. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|