Senate | 03/22/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2016 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2016. | ||
House | 03/17/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/16/2016 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Prefiled. |