Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Appel, Morrish, and Gary Smith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Reynolds, Nancy Landry, and Pope.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|