House | 04/19/2016 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 50. Failed to pass. | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016. | ||
House | 04/13/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/12/2016 | Reported with amendments (13-0). | ||
House | 03/29/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/28/2016 | Read by title. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |