House | 04/27/2016 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 59. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | Reported favorably (8-4). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 03/03/2016 | Prefiled. |