House
|
05/10/2016
|
Effective date: 05/10/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 49.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/06/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|