House
|
06/09/2016
|
Effective date: 08/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 435.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 9. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|