House
|
05/17/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 24, nays 65. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Reported with amendments (17-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|