House
|
05/26/2016
|
Effective date: 05/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 251.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|