House
|
05/10/2016
|
Effective date: 08/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 53.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 4, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|