House | 05/17/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/09/2016 | Reported without amendments (7-0-1). | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/02/2016 | Reported with amendments (14-3). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Prefiled. |