House | 04/05/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 03/31/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2016. | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/30/2016 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 03/22/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/21/2016 | Reported favorably (15-7). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Prefiled. |