House
|
05/09/2016
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 40. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Reported with amendments (5-4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|