Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Boudreaux, and Cortez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Miguez, Pearson, and DeVillier.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Reported favorably (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/29/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|