House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: 07/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 551.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 12. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|