House
|
06/16/2016
|
Effective date: 01/01/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 508.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 15 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 67, nays 33. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Moreno, Danahay, and Lance Harris.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Riser, and Morrell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2016
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|