Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/06/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|