House | 05/04/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/28/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2016. | ||
House | 04/28/2016 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/27/2016 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 04/20/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Reported with amendments (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Prefiled. |