House
|
06/02/2016
|
Effective date: 06/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 311.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/22/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2016
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|