Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|