House
|
05/31/2016
|
Effective date: 05/31/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 292.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Reported with amendments (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|