Senate | 05/05/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/03/2016 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/28/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016. | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Reported with amendments (15-5). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/12/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/12/2016. | ||
House | 02/08/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/08/2016 | Prefiled. |